Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/04/2019 at 16:00:57 (UTC).

NARANJO, ERMINDA VS CACERES, CARLOS MANUEL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 NARANJO, ERMINDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CACERES, CARLOS MANUEL. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES D and ROBERT OSTROV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES D

ROBERT OSTROV

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NARANJO, ERMINDA

Respondent

CACERES, CARLOS MANUEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Event HR scheduled on 8/20/2019 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT OSTROV presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING: FOR 08/20/2019 @ 03:30PM (CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FILED (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MARRIAGE FROM CUBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED ISSUED 10/31/2016 (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDEN OR MINOR CHILDREN (COPY TO MAGISTRATES OFFICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CARLOSM MANUEL CACERES (GIVEN BACK TO PETITIONER FOR SERV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW ACTIONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INIDIGENT STATUS (APPROVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case 262019DR000401DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge: SLOAN , JAMES D assigned

    Read MoreRead Less