This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 08/04/2022 at 14:02:19 (UTC).

MYERS, JOANN, SMITH, DENNIS G Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 MYERS, JOANN, SMITH, DENNIS G was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL ROBIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MYERS, JOANN

Decedent

SMITH, DENNIS G

Not Classified By Court

SMITH, JOANN

SMITH, DENNIS GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RAMUNNI, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMEMORANDUM PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006628

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY CERTIFICATE OF DEATH *ORIGINAL FILED*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DEBTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CP000105CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less