This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 06/30/2019 at 18:01:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS WRIGHT, RACHEL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WRIGHT, RACHEL. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WRIGHT, RACHEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

Return of Service Served DIR TO: RACHEL WRIGHT ON 6/18/19

06/21/2019:Return of Service Served DIR TO: RACHEL WRIGHT ON 6/18/19

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

06/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service Served DIR TO: RACHEL WRIGHT ON 6/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RACHEL WRIGHT/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Case 262019SC000268SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI