This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 08/08/2019 at 18:00:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SHEKOSKI, ROSE

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHEKOSKI, ROSE. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SHEKOSKI, ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

07/15/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/15/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 8/21/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019009200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ROSE SHEKOSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Case 262019SC000320SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Event Date: 08/21/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L