This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 03/19/2021 at 16:00:39 (UTC).

MANCINI, TRACEY A VS MANCINI, CHARLES R

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 MANCINI, TRACEY A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MANCINI, CHARLES R. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES DEAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MANCINI, TRACEY A

Respondents

MANCINI, CHARLES R

MANCINI, C RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

KLAUS, DALE WILLIAM

VOGELSANG, BETH TYLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketQUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DOM CASES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER FILED (husband's)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO CORRECT CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase 262021DR000085DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Klaus Jr, Dale William

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vogelsang, Beth Tyler