This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/20/2019 at 18:00:25 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS HERRERA, CHRISTINE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERRERA, CHRISTINE. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

HERRERA, CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Return of Service Served DIR TO: CHRISTINE HERRERA ON 7/6/19

07/08/2019:Return of Service Served DIR TO: CHRISTINE HERRERA ON 7/6/19

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

06/26/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service Served DIR TO: CHRISTINE HERRERA ON 7/6/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008396

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CHRISTINE HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case 262019SC000289SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C