This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/12/2019 14:00:54

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 a Probate - Other Probate case was filed by HORVATH, JOHN, HORVATH, MARY MARGARET in the jurisdiction of Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 06/12/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Probate - Other Probate
  • Jurisdiction Hendry County Courts
  • Judge HILL, DARRELL R
  • Courthouse Hendry County Courthouse
  • County Hendry
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Applicant HORVATH, JOHN
  • Represented By
    • KOTEEN, MARK ALAN
  • Decedent HORVATH, MARY MARGARET
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $4.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008625
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00
  • 07/03/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED
  • 07/03/2019
  • CASE CLOSED
  • 07/03/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED PROBATE
  • 06/28/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE
  • 06/12/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT
  • 06/12/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT
  • 06/12/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY CERTIFICATE OF DEATH FILED
  • 06/12/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION
  • 06/12/2019
  • Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007392
  • 06/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00
  • 06/12/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/12/2019
  • Case 262019CP000079CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/12/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.