This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/19/2019 at 18:01:17 (UTC).

HARVEY GARCIA, KATHLEEN SUE VS WALKER, DEREK ARNOLD

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 HARVEY GARCIA, KATHLEEN SUE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALKER, DEREK ARNOLD. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARVEY GARCIA, KATHLEEN SUE

Defendant

WALKER, DEREK ARNOLD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED:

06/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED:

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: DEREK A WALKER/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: DEREK A WALKER/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

06/25/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: DEREK A WALKER/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Active Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Case 262019SC000281SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less