This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 07/20/2019 at 20:05:15 (UTC).

H E HILL FOUNDATION INC VS GONZALEZ, CLARA Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 H E HILL FOUNDATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GONZALEZ, CLARA. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H E HILL FOUNDATION INC

Defendants

TEIXIDOR, ALFREDO MAXIMO

GONZALEZ, CLARA

GONZALEZ, OMAIDA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED CLARA GONZALEZ

07/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CLARA GONZALEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED OMAIDA GONZALEZ

07/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED OMAIDA GONZALEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED ALFREDO MAXIMO TEIXIDOR

07/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ALFREDO MAXIMO TEIXIDOR

NOTICE

06/27/2019:NOTICE

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

06/27/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

06/27/2019:VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Payment received: $30.00 Receipt Number MX 2019009169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $30.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED CLARA GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED OMAIDA GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ALFREDO MAXIMO TEIXIDOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008390

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Case 262019CA000452CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HE HILL FOUNDATION INC is a litigant