This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 07/10/2019 at 20:01:31 (UTC).

H E HILL FOUNDATION INC VS ELLA III LLC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 H E HILL FOUNDATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ELLA III LLC. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H E HILL FOUNDATION INC

Defendant

ELLA III LLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

06/28/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELLA II, LLC./EMAILED ATTNY

06/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELLA II, LLC./EMAILED ATTNY

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

06/24/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

06/24/2019:VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELLA II, LLC./EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 262019CA000437CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELLA III LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HE HILL FOUNDATION INC is a litigant