This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 18:01:05 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, LEIDY M VS MIZELL, ANNETTE

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 GONZALEZ, LEIDY M filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIZELL, ANNETTE. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, LEIDY M

Defendant

MIZELL, ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED

07/17/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: ANNETTE MIZELL ON 7/8/19

07/09/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: ANNETTE MIZELL ON 7/8/19

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

07/02/2019:APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ANNETTE MIZELL/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

07/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ANNETTE MIZELL/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • Updated Event PT on 7/24/2019 0900 AM Judge DARRELL HILL results Cancelled on 7/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: ANNETTE MIZELL ON 7/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ANNETTE MIZELL/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Active Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case 262019SC000297SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less