This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/09/2022 at 20:05:39 (UTC).

GAITAN, LUIS A VS ESPER, ALFONSO BUJA

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 GAITAN, LUIS A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ESPER, ALFONSO BUJA. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES D and SLOAN, JAMES DEAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES D

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAITAN, LUIS A

Defendant

ESPER, ALFONSO BUJA

Not Classified By Court

B, ALFONSO ESPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMOLD, PETER MORRIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

04/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ALFONSO BUJA ESPER

04/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ALFONSO BUJA ESPER

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

04/25/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

04/27/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ALFONSO BUJA ESPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004091

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000236CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARMOLD, PETER MORRIS