This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/05/2019 at 22:02:11 (UTC).

FLORIDA WATER AND MOLD RESTORA VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 FLORIDA WATER AND MOLD RESTORA filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA WATER AND MOLD RESTORA

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINEO, PETER JOHN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

06/11/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

NOTICE

06/11/2019:NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

07/03/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

NOTICE

06/11/2019:NOTICE

Designation of Email

07/03/2019:Designation of Email

REQUEST

06/11/2019:REQUEST

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Designation of Email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007485

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE DESIGNATING EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Case 262019CC000271CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.