Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 06/30/2019 at 22:01:49 (UTC).

FIRARA, LLC AGENT: SUGAR REALT VS QUINONES, FELIX

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 FIRARA, LLC AGENT SUGAR REALT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against QUINONES, FELIX. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRARA, LLC AGENT: SUGAR REALT

Defendant

QUINONES, FELIX

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: FELIX QUINONES/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: FELIX QUINONES/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

06/10/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: FELIX QUINONES ON 6/14/19

06/18/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: FELIX QUINONES ON 6/14/19

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: FELIX QUINONES ON 6/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: FELIX QUINONES/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case 262019CC000263CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less