This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 02/27/2019 at 03:42:24 (UTC).

EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO VS SANDERS, MARY S

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANDERS, MARY S. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO

Defendant

SANDERS, MARY S

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

01/28/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MARY SANDERS/CERTIFIED MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

01/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MARY SANDERS/CERTIFIED MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: MARY S SANDERS ON 2/5/19

02/22/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: MARY S SANDERS ON 2/5/19

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: MARY S SANDERS ON 2/5/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MARY SANDERS/CERTIFIED MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $316.56 Receipt Number MX 2019001025

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $316.56 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $316.56 Balance Remaining $316.56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketActive Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 2/20/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketJudge: HILL , DARRELL R Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000041SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/20/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO is a litigant