This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 03/14/2019 at 18:01:19 (UTC).

EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO VS COTTON-GODOY, ELAINA

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COTTON-GODOY, ELAINA. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO

Defendant

COTTON-GODOY, ELAINA

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

02/18/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELAINA COTTON-GODOY/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

02/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELAINA COTTON-GODOY/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: ELAINA COTTON-GODOY ON 2/20/19

02/22/2019:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: ELAINA COTTON-GODOY ON 2/20/19

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: ELAINA COTTON-GODOY ON 2/20/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: ELAINA COTTON-GODOY/SEND TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketActive Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 3/20/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $191.56 Receipt Number MX 2019002069

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $191.56 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $191.56 Balance Remaining $191.56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000093SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketJudge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 03/20/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO is a litigant