This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 19:00:58 (UTC).

EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO VS BRANAMAN, JOHN

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRANAMAN, JOHN. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVERGLADES FEDERAL CREDIT UNIO

Defendant

BRANAMAN, JOHN

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JOHN BRANAMAN/MAILED COPY TO PLAINTIFF/SENDTO GLADES COUNTY SHERIFF

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JOHN BRANAMAN/MAILED COPY TO PLAINTIFF/SENDTO GLADES COUNTY SHERIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JOHN BRANAMAN/MAILED COPY TO PLAINTIFF/SENDTO GLADES COUNTY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketActive Process PRETRIAL NOTICE OF CONFERENCE & SUMMONS Sc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $191.56 Receipt Number MX 2019015174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $191.56 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $191.56 Balance Remaining $191.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000571SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: HILL , DARRELL R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/22/2020 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 2ND FL

    Read MoreRead Less