This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/08/2019 at 18:00:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MADELAINE BONILLA

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MADELAINE BONILLA. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MADELAINE BONILLA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE

06/14/2019:NOTICE

MOTION

06/14/2019:MOTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

06/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019007700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MADELAINE BONILLA/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 262019SC000274SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant