This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 08/04/2019 at 18:01:53 (UTC).

DCOTA CONTRACTING INC AAO JOSE VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 DCOTA CONTRACTING INC AAO JOSE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DCOTA CONTRACTING INC AAO JOSE

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECHERT, CHARLES HAROLD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/11/2019:Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/11/2019:Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/11/2019:Notice of Taking Deposition

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/11/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

07/11/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 8/21/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Case 262019SC000311SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Event Date: 08/21/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bechert, Charles H, III