This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 03/18/2021 at 18:03:32 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS SANCHEZ, LISBETH

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 CITIBANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANCHEZ, LISBETH. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL, HILL, DARRELL ROBIN and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL ROBIN

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

SANCHEZ, LISBETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAREY, PATRICK A

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: LISBETH SANCHEZ (EMAILED TO ATTY)

02/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: LISBETH SANCHEZ (EMAILED TO ATTY)

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

02/24/2021:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

02/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/19/2021 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 2ND FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 5/19/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: LISBETH SANCHEZ (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase 262021SC000108SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK A CAREY