This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 02/27/2019 at 03:26:17 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS LEOS, MEREIDA M

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEOS, MEREIDA M. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

LEOS, MEREIDA M

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

01/25/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

01/25/2019:MOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

01/25/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MEREIDA LEOS/EMAILED ATTNY

01/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MEREIDA LEOS/EMAILED ATTNY

Return of Service Unserved

02/14/2019:Return of Service Unserved

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 2/20/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2019001093

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MEREIDA LEOS/EMAILED ATTNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO PERMIT TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000051SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 02/20/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant