This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 06/24/2019 at 18:00:44 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS BLANC, RACHELLE

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLANC, RACHELLE. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

BLANC, RACHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RACHELE BLANC/EMAILED ATTNY

06/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RACHELE BLANC/EMAILED ATTNY

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

06/04/2019:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

06/04/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: RACHELE BLANC/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006956

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Case 262019SC000255SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel