This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 08/08/2019 at 18:03:54 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS AROCHO, MARIA M

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AROCHO, MARIA M. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

AROCHO, MARIA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION

07/15/2019:MOTION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

07/15/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 8/21/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019009218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: MARIA AROCHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Case 262019SC000322SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Event Date: 08/21/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel