This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 20:02:02 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS RODRIGUEZ, RENE

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, RENE. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, RENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

07/15/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RENE RODRIGUEZ

07/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RENE RODRIGUEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RENE RODRIGUEZ

07/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: RENE RODRIGUEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEOVANA DE SOUZA

07/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEOVANA DE SOUZA

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEOVANA DE SOUZA

07/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEOVANA DE SOUZA

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

07/19/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Unserved RENE RODRIGUEZ

07/21/2022:Return of Service Unserved RENE RODRIGUEZ

Return of Service Unserved GEOVANA DE SOUZA

07/21/2022:Return of Service Unserved GEOVANA DE SOUZA

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: RENE RODRIGUEZ

07/26/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: RENE RODRIGUEZ

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: GEOVANNA DE SOUZA

07/26/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: GEOVANNA DE SOUZA

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: GEOVANNA DE SOUZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: RENE RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved GEOVANA DE SOUZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved RENE RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022007056

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $440.00 Receipt Number MX 2022007000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $440.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $440.00 Balance Remaining $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEOVANA DE SOUZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEOVANA DE SOUZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: RENE RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: RENE RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000400CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO