This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/03/2022 at 20:06:35 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS OPEN SPACE LAND LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OPEN SPACE LAND LLC. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

OPEN SPACE LAND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

09/06/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

09/06/2022:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: OPEN SPACE LAND LLC

09/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: OPEN SPACE LAND LLC

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

09/08/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Served OPEN SPACE LAND LLC ON 9/9/2022

09/16/2022:Return of Service Served OPEN SPACE LAND LLC ON 9/9/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Served OPEN SPACE LAND LLC ON 9/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008842

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008760

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: OPEN SPACE LAND LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000508CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant