This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/07/2022 at 20:10:50 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS MENENDEZ, FELIX

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MENENDEZ, FELIX. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

MENENDEZ, FELIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

10/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

10/19/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: FELIX MENENDEZ

10/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: FELIX MENENDEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ

10/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

10/20/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Unserved FELIX MENENDEZ

10/27/2022:Return of Service Unserved FELIX MENENDEZ

Return of Service Unserved ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ

10/27/2022:Return of Service Unserved ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ

SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

10/27/2022:SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

NOTICE OF ACTION *Emailed to Okeechobee News*

10/27/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION *Emailed to Okeechobee News*

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

10/31/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION *Emailed to Okeechobee News*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved FELIX MENENDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022010119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2022010118

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: FELIX MENENDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000603CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant