This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/26/2022 at 20:09:16 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS MARINO, ANTHONY A

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARINO, ANTHONY A. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

MARINO, ANTHONY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

08/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

08/30/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MARINO (NAPLES ADDRESS)

08/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MARINO (NAPLES ADDRESS)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MARINO (BONITA SPRINGS ADDRESS)

08/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MARINO (BONITA SPRINGS ADDRESS)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WEST COAST FUND, LLC

08/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: WEST COAST FUND, LLC

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

08/31/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Unserved ANTHONY A MARINO

09/12/2022:Return of Service Unserved ANTHONY A MARINO

RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

09/14/2022:RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

Return of Service Served ANTHONY A MARINO ON 9/14/2022

09/19/2022:Return of Service Served ANTHONY A MARINO ON 9/14/2022

Return of Service Unserved WEST COAST FUND LLC

09/26/2022:Return of Service Unserved WEST COAST FUND LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved WEST COAST FUND LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Served ANTHONY A MARINO ON 9/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved ANTHONY A MARINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008533

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2022008463

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: WEST COAST FUND, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MARINO (BONITA SPRINGS ADDRESS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MARINO (NAPLES ADDRESS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000495CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO