This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/30/2022 at 20:03:44 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EQUITY TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

05/04/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EQUITY TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIAN FBO LOUIS J. WEINSTEIN IRA (OHIO)

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EQUITY TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIAN FBO LOUIS J. WEINSTEIN IRA (OHIO)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EQUITY TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIAN FBO LOUIS J. WEINSTEIN IRA (FLORIDA)

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EQUITY TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIAN FBO LOUIS J. WEINSTEIN IRA (FLORIDA)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELLA III LLC

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELLA III LLC

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

05/05/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Served ELLA III LLC 5/11/22

05/13/2022:Return of Service Served ELLA III LLC 5/11/22

Return of Service Unserved EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

05/15/2022:Return of Service Unserved EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

Return of Service Unserved EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

05/18/2022:Return of Service Unserved EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Served ELLA III LLC 5/11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ELLA III LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EQUITY TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIAN FBO LOUIS J. WEINSTEIN IRA (FLORIDA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EQUITY TRUST COMPANY CUSTODIAN FBO LOUIS J. WEINSTEIN IRA (OHIO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000256CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/4/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO