This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/20/2022 at 20:02:53 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS COPP, EDRIC K JR

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COPP, EDRIC K JR. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES D and SLOAN, JAMES DEAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES D

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

COPP, EDRIC K JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/24/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

05/24/2022:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EDRIC K COPP JR.

05/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EDRIC K COPP JR.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAZUMI COPP

05/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAZUMI COPP

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAREN MORRIS IN TRUST FOR LI-SHANN AND COURTNEY BIGBY

05/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAREN MORRIS IN TRUST FOR LI-SHANN AND COURTNEY BIGBY

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

05/25/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Unserved KAREN MORRIS IN TRUST FOR LI-SHANN & COURTNEY BIGBY

06/09/2022:Return of Service Unserved KAREN MORRIS IN TRUST FOR LI-SHANN & COURTNEY BIGBY

Return of Service Unserved EDRIC K COPP

06/14/2022:Return of Service Unserved EDRIC K COPP

Return of Service Unserved KAZUMI COPP

06/14/2022:Return of Service Unserved KAZUMI COPP

SWRORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

06/14/2022:SWRORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

06/14/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

06/16/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWRORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved KAZUMI COPP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved EDRIC K COPP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved KAREN MORRIS IN TRUST FOR LI-SHANN & COURTNEY BIGBY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $18.50 Receipt Number MX 2022005215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $18.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 2022005192

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAREN MORRIS IN TRUST FOR LI-SHANN AND COURTNEY BIGBY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAZUMI COPP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EDRIC K COPP JR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000294CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant