This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/17/2022 at 20:02:27 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS CARTER, CORDEN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CARTER, CORDEN. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

CARTER, CORDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

09/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

09/27/2022:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CORDEN CARTER

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CORDEN CARTER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MEDLEY

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MEDLEY

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

10/04/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Unserved CORDEN CARTER

10/05/2022:Return of Service Unserved CORDEN CARTER

Return of Service Unserved ANTHONY MEDLEY

10/05/2022:Return of Service Unserved ANTHONY MEDLEY

SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

10/07/2022:SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

10/07/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

10/14/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved ANTHONY MEDLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved CORDEN CARTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022009507

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2022009464

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANTHONY MEDLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CORDEN CARTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000572CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less