This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/25/2022 at 20:03:38 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS BELIZAIRE, HANS R

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BELIZAIRE, HANS R. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES DEAN and SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

BELIZAIRE, HANS R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

07/07/2022:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HANS R BELIZAIRE (LAKE WORTH)

07/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HANS R BELIZAIRE (LAKE WORTH)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HANS R BELIZAIRE (BOYNTON BEACH)

07/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HANS R BELIZAIRE (BOYNTON BEACH)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE (LAKE WORTH)

07/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE (LAKE WORTH)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE (BOYNTON BEACH)

07/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE (BOYNTON BEACH)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

07/11/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

Return of Service Unserved HANS R BELIZAIRE

07/18/2022:Return of Service Unserved HANS R BELIZAIRE

Return of Service Unserved EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE

07/18/2022:Return of Service Unserved EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE

Return of Service Unserved HANS R BELIZAIRE

07/21/2022:Return of Service Unserved HANS R BELIZAIRE

Return of Service Unserved EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE

07/21/2022:Return of Service Unserved EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE

SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

07/22/2022:SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

NOTICE OF ACTION *emailed to Okeechobee News*

07/22/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION *emailed to Okeechobee News*

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

07/22/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION *emailed to Okeechobee News*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved HANS R BELIZAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved HANS R BELIZAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022006838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $440.00 Balance Remaining $440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE (BOYNTON BEACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: EVELITHA C BELIZAIRE (LAKE WORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: HANS R BELIZAIRE (BOYNTON BEACH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: HANS R BELIZAIRE (LAKE WORTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000384CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant