This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/30/2022 at 20:03:21 (UTC).

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP VS ALEXIS, DAVID L

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 CAREER FINANCIAL CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALEXIS, DAVID L. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES D and SLOAN, JAMES DEAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES D

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAREER FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

ALEXIS, DAVID L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACIA, ALBERTO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/06/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

05/06/2022:COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L ALEXIS (OKEECHOBEE)

05/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L ALEXIS (OKEECHOBEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L ALEXIS (WEST PALM BEACH)

05/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L ALEXIS (WEST PALM BEACH)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/06/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

Return of Service Unserved DAVID L. ALEXIS

05/17/2022:Return of Service Unserved DAVID L. ALEXIS

Return of Service Unserved DAVID L. ALEXIS

05/17/2022:Return of Service Unserved DAVID L. ALEXIS

SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

05/18/2022:SWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

05/18/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

05/19/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION *EMAILED TO OKEECHOBEE NEWS*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved DAVID L. ALEXIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service Unserved DAVID L. ALEXIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004656

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L ALEXIS (WEST PALM BEACH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID L ALEXIS (OKEECHOBEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004634

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCase 262022CA000259CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREER FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant