This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 04/03/2019 at 18:01:19 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS ESPINOSA, CODY L

Case Summary

On 03/10/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESPINOSA, CODY L. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

ESPINOSA, CODY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, KARLA M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

03/10/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/10/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION

03/10/2019:MOTION

Proposed Order

03/10/2019:Proposed Order

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEvent PT scheduled on 4/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003167

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CODY ESPINOSA/EMAILED ATTNY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2019
  • DocketCase 262019SC000146SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEvent Date: 04/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ, KARLA M