This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 18:01:28 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS ALI, HAYEL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALI, HAYEL. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

ALI, HAYEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

08/01/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: HAYEL ALI/EMAILED ATTNY

07/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: HAYEL ALI/EMAILED ATTNY

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPERANCE

07/08/2019:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPERANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

07/08/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 8/21/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: HAYEL ALI/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPERANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Case 262019SC000310SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Event Date: 08/21/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUIR , DANIELA