This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 02/27/2019 at 02:26:51 (UTC).

BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC. A/A/O VS FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC A/A/O filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC. A/A/O

Defendant

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS, ISABEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

02/21/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: FOREMOST INSURANCE /EMAILED ATTNY

01/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: FOREMOST INSURANCE /EMAILED ATTNY

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

01/10/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

01/10/2019:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/10/2019:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

01/10/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

01/10/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 2/20/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019000500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: FOREMOST INSURANCE /EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Case 262019CC000024CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Event Date: 02/20/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC. A/A/O is a litigant

Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arias, Isabel