This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 03/16/2019 at 20:00:30 (UTC).

BREWSTER, ALPHONSO Et Al VS GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 BREWSTER, ALPHONSO filed an Other lawsuit against GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SLOAN, JAMES D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SLOAN, JAMES D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BREWSTER, ALPHONSO

BREWSTER, TYRONNE

Defendant

GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT, DIANNE C

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

02/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

02/26/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

02/26/2019:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/26/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

02/26/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2019002402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case 262019CA000158CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dianne Grant Esq