This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/24/2019 at 18:00:42 (UTC).

BREATHE CLEAN AGAIN LLC AAO PE VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Case Summary

On 06/30/2019 BREATHE CLEAN AGAIN LLC AAO PE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BREATHE CLEAN AGAIN LLC AAO PE

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUERRERO, CRISTOPHER R.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

07/03/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/03/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

07/03/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

07/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

06/30/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008609

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 8/21/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Payment received: $175.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • Case 262019SC000302SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Event Date: 08/21/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Breathe Clean Again (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUERRERO, CRISTOPHER R