This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/18/2019 at 18:00:56 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS SANCHEZ, IRIS MONIQUE

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANCHEZ, IRIS MONIQUE. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DARRELL HILL and HILL, DARRELL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DARRELL HILL

HILL, DARRELL R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

SANCHEZ, IRIS MONIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZYMANSKI, MATEUSZ MARCIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: IRIS M. SANCHEZ/EMAILED ATTNY

06/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: IRIS M. SANCHEZ/EMAILED ATTNY

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

06/24/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: IRIS M. SANCHEZ/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case 262019SC000285SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZYMANSKI, MATEUSZ MARCIN