This case was last updated from Hendry County Courts on 07/12/2019 at 18:01:17 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS CADMAN, JUDITH A

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CADMAN, JUDITH A. This case was filed in Hendry County Courts, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, DARRELL R and DARRELL HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hendry County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, DARRELL R

DARRELL HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

CADMAN, JUDITH A

Not Classified By Court

CADMAN, JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

06/18/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

06/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Event PT scheduled on 7/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DARRELL HILL presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2019008089

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: JUDITH CADMAN/EMAILED ATTNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Case 262019SC000276SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Event Date: 07/24/2019 09:00; Judge: HILL, DARRELL R; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 2ND FLOOR COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Modlin, Scott Eric