This case was last updated from Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/30/2022 at 09:21:50 (UTC).

ALSTON, BARBARA H Et Al VS ADORNO, JOSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2008 ALSTON, BARBARA H filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ADORNO, JOSE. This case was filed in Hendry County - Twentieth Judicial Circuit Court, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREIDER, CHRISTINE HISSAM and THOMPSON, NICHOLAS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREIDER, CHRISTINE HISSAM

THOMPSON, NICHOLAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAILMAN, JENNIFER

ALSTON, BARBARA H

HOPPMAN, ROBERT D

THE HOWARD E HILL FOUNDATION

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, ELINA E

ADORNO, JOSE

U/K, TENANT ONE

U/K, TENANT TWO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS, JOHN JAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2011
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/20/2011 11:00; Judge: THOMPSON, NICHOLAS R; Docket Type: FS; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketATTORNEY'S AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL EXPENSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FILED & RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • DocketHENDRY GLADES BOX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE FILED SET FOR 4/20/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • DocketSUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT FILED RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • DocketSUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS RET UNSERVED & FILED DIR TO:ELINA E RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS RET UNSERVED & FILED DIR TO: JOSE ADORNO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS RET UNSERVED & FILED DIR TO: UK TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS RET UNSERVED & FILED DIR TO: UK TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO:U/K TENANT TWO/FWD TO HCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO:U/K TENANT ONE/FWD TO HCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO:JOSE ADORNO/RTD TO JAY WATKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO:ELINA RODRIGUEZ/RTD TO JAY WATKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOWARD E HILL FOUNDATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS, JOHN JAY