This case was last updated from Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County on 07/14/2020 at 12:09:09 (UTC).

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS MARTINEZ, CLAUDIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARTINEZ, CLAUDIA. This case was filed in Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County, Hendry County Courthouse located in Hendry, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SLOAN, JAMES D and SLOAN, JAMES DEAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twentieth Circuit Courts - Hendry County

  • Courthouse:

    Hendry County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hendry, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SLOAN, JAMES D

SLOAN, JAMES DEAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

TENANT, UNKNOWN

MARTINEZ, CLAUDIA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEDRO MARTIN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDIA MART

PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA PEDRO A MAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, LESLIE SINGLETERRY

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

03/03/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDIA MARTINEZ (01-09-2020)

02/13/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDIA MARTINEZ (01-09-2020)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

02/05/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

NOTICE OF ACTION FILED: MARCH 9, 2020 (EMAILED TO CLEWISTON NEWS)

02/05/2020:NOTICE OF ACTION FILED: MARCH 9, 2020 (EMAILED TO CLEWISTON NEWS)

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

02/05/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: CLAUDIA MARTINEZ 1/15/20

01/28/2020:SUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: CLAUDIA MARTINEZ 1/15/20

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: DIR TO: UNKNOWN TENANT

01/10/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: DIR TO: UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA: PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

12/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA: PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNKNOWN TENANT

12/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDIA MARTINEZ

12/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDIA MARTINEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CLAUDIA MARTINEZ

12/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: CLAUDIA MARTINEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA: PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

12/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA: PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE

12/17/2019:AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE

Designation of Email

12/17/2019:Designation of Email

VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/17/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

12/17/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

12/17/2019:COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDIA MARTINEZ (01-09-2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION FILED: MARCH 9, 2020 (EMAILED TO CLEWISTON NEWS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RET SERVED DIR TO: CLAUDIA MARTINEZ 1/15/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED: DIR TO: UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DIR TO: PEDRO MARTINEZ AKA: PEDRO A. MARTINEZ CARCASSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROP. OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION (Regarding Possession of the Original Note)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $973.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase 262019CA000873CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less