This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 11/20/2020 at 13:31:08 (UTC).

VALENCIA HARMONY HOUSING LLC VS CIMMINO, THERESA

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 VALENCIA HARMONY HOUSING LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CIMMINO, THERESA. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HORTON, DAVID, DAVID HORTON and HORTON, DAVID NEAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HORTON, DAVID

DAVID HORTON

HORTON, DAVID NEAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENCIA HARMONY HOUSING LLC

Defendant

CIMMINO, THERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT **DEFENDANT AGREES TO MOVE OUT BY 11-23-2020

11/13/2020:DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT **DEFENDANT AGREES TO MOVE OUT BY 11-23-2020

NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT

11/05/2020:NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT

RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS SERVED 11-4-20 ON THERESA CIMMINO

11/05/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS SERVED 11-4-20 ON THERESA CIMMINO

NOTICE OF HEARING **11-13-2020 AT 1030AM

10/29/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING **11-13-2020 AT 1030AM

5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ISSUED TO THERESA CIMMINO

10/28/2020:5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ISSUED TO THERESA CIMMINO

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/28/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

10/28/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketORDER GOVERNING POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to Case Reopen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketReopened for 2 Other on 11/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketReopen Date: 11/18/2020; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/13/2020 10:30; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: EVICTION HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: 012026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT **DEFENDANT AGREES TO MOVE OUT BY 11-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: HORTON , DAVID Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS SERVED 11-4-20 ON THERESA CIMMINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEvent EVICTION HEARING scheduled on 11/13/2020 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING **11-13-2020 AT 1030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005898

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO ISSUED TO THERESA CIMMINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase 252020CC000173CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P Wolk