This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 10/30/2020 at 14:34:07 (UTC).

STATON HOUSING INC VS WEBER, LACY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 STATON HOUSING INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WEBER, LACY. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HORTON, DAVID NEAL, HORTON, DAVID and DAVID HORTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HORTON, DAVID NEAL

HORTON, DAVID

DAVID HORTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATON HOUSING INC

Defendant

WEBER, LACY

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION: FROM COURT - CASE DISMISSED

10/19/2020:DISPOSITION: FROM COURT - CASE DISMISSED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON EVICTIONS SUMMONS SERVED LACY WEBBER ON 10/7/2020

10/08/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON EVICTIONS SUMMONS SERVED LACY WEBBER ON 10/7/2020

NOTICE OF HEARING EVICTIONS SENT WITH SUMMONS

10/06/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING EVICTIONS SENT WITH SUMMONS

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LACY WEBBER **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

10/06/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LACY WEBBER **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

COMPLAINT

10/06/2020:COMPLAINT

THREE DAY WRITTEN NOTICE TO VACATE FILED

10/06/2020:THREE DAY WRITTEN NOTICE TO VACATE FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/19/2020 15:30; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: EVICTION HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JAN 2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION: FROM COURT - CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPHONE CALL: FROM STATON HOUSING INFORMING THAT HARDEE COUNTY WILL BE PAYING HER RENT SO HE WILL NOT BE EVICTING HER AND TO CANCEL THE HEARING: CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketANSWER FROM DEFENDANT LACY WEBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON EVICTIONS SUMMONS SERVED LACY WEBBER ON 10/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MAILED SUMMON AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketEvent EVICTION HEARING scheduled on 10/19/2020 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO LACY WEBBER **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHREE DAY WRITTEN NOTICE TO VACATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005399

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase 252020CC000158CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJudge: HORTON , DAVID assigned

    Read MoreRead Less