This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 10/20/2020 at 13:31:37 (UTC).

SORIA, RICKY MARTIN VS ANSELMO, FREDDY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 SORIA, RICKY MARTIN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANSELMO, FREDDY. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HORTON, DAVID NEAL, HORTON, DAVID and DAVID HORTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HORTON, DAVID NEAL

HORTON, DAVID

DAVID HORTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORIA, RICKY MARTIN

Defendant

ANSELMO, FREDDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SANTIAGO, ROLANDO JOSE

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS

10/16/2020:DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS

MAIL RECIEVED FROM DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY WITH UNSIGNED CHECKS TO PAY INTO COURT REGISTRY **MAILED BACK TO ATTORNEY

10/13/2020:MAIL RECIEVED FROM DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY WITH UNSIGNED CHECKS TO PAY INTO COURT REGISTRY **MAILED BACK TO ATTORNEY

EMAIL SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

10/09/2020:EMAIL SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT MAILED FUNDS TO CLERKS OFFICE FOR DEPOSIT INTO COURT REGISTRY

10/08/2020:NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT MAILED FUNDS TO CLERKS OFFICE FOR DEPOSIT INTO COURT REGISTRY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FROM ROLANDO SANTIAGO

10/07/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FROM ROLANDO SANTIAGO

RETURN OF SERVICE ON EVICTIONS SUMMONS SERVED ON 10-01-2020

10/05/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON EVICTIONS SUMMONS SERVED ON 10-01-2020

NOTICE OF HEARING **ATTACHED TO SUMMONS **MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

09/29/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING **ATTACHED TO SUMMONS **MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO FREDDY ALSELMO

09/29/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO FREDDY ALSELMO

CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

09/29/2020:CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

NOTICE FROM OWNER GIVEN 30 DAY NOTICE TO VACATE

09/29/2020:NOTICE FROM OWNER GIVEN 30 DAY NOTICE TO VACATE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/29/2020:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/16/2020 10:30; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: EVICTION HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: SANTIAGO, ROLANDO J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: 012026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER CAUSE TO CIRCUIT COURT FR ATTY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RECIEVED FROM DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY WITH UNSIGNED CHECKS TO PAY INTO COURT REGISTRY **MAILED BACK TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/09/2020 10:30; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: EVICTION HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: SANTIAGO, ROLANDO J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; COUNTER-CLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; PETITION FOR DECARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FROM OWNER GIVEN 30 DAY NOTICE TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase 252020CC000152CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketJudge: HORTON , DAVID assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANTIAGO , ROLANDO JOSE