This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 11/20/2020 at 20:31:22 (UTC).

SMITH, DANIEL J VS HAY, REBECCA L

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 SMITH, DANIEL J filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HAY, REBECCA L. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAIDEN, MICHAEL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAIDEN, MICHAEL E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, DANIEL J

Respondent

HAY, REBECCA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COPLEY, ALISON B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FATHER'S CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDATE RECORD ELIGIBLE FOR DESTRUCTION: JAN 2044

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAMENDED STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY WITH PARENTING PLAN ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFID FROM RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFID FROM PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED 10-30-20 ON REBECCA HAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF INFORMAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FR ATTY COPLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase 252020DR000378DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COPLEY, ALISON B