This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 11/10/2020 at 22:34:13 (UTC).

SHULL, NANCY JANE, SHULL, ROBERT D. JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 SHULL, NANCY JANE, SHULL, ROBERT D JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAIDEN, MICHAEL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAIDEN, MICHAEL E

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SHULL, ROBERT D. JR

Decedent

SHULL, NANCY JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

EVERS, KENNETH BRUCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCODICIL TO THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT AND FIRT CODICIL TO LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: RAIDEN , MICHAEL E Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE ROBERT SHULL, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase 252020CP000093CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVERS, KENNETH BRUCE