This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 11/26/2020 at 17:44:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS WINGATE, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINGATE, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HORTON, DAVID NEAL, HORTON, DAVID and DAVID HORTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HORTON, DAVID NEAL

HORTON, DAVID

DAVID HORTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

WINGATE, MICHAEL

Wauchula, FL 33873-3504

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ON 11-13-2020

11/19/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ON 11-13-2020

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO MICHAEL WINGATE **INSTRUCTIONS FOR VIRTUAL HEARING ATTACHED

10/27/2020:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO MICHAEL WINGATE **INSTRUCTIONS FOR VIRTUAL HEARING ATTACHED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM CLAIM $1,460.46 COST$185.00

10/27/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM CLAIM $1,460.46 COST$185.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/14/2020 09:00; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: PRETRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ON 11-13-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketEvent PRETRIAL scheduled on 12/14/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: HORTON , DAVID Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2020005863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO MICHAEL WINGATE **INSTRUCTIONS FOR VIRTUAL HEARING ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM CLAIM $1,460.46 COST$185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase 252020SC000172SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E