This case was last updated from Hardee County Courts on 07/10/2019 at 13:30:53 (UTC).

KIRKLAND, FRANK VS DRAKE, KATELYN Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 KIRKLAND, FRANK filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DRAKE, KATELYN. This case was filed in Hardee County Courts, Hardee County Courthouse located in Hardee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HORTON, DAVID and DAVID HORTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hardee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hardee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hardee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HORTON, DAVID

DAVID HORTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIRKLAND, FRANK

Defendants

DRAKE, KATELYN

SUGGS, TYLER JAMISON

 

Court Documents

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO TYLER SUGGS **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO TYLER SUGGS **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS FOR TYLER SUGGS SERVED ON 06142019

07/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS FOR TYLER SUGGS SERVED ON 06142019

NOTICE OF HEARING 06282019 11AM **MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/19/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING 06282019 11AM **MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

THREE DAY WRITTEN NOTICE TO VACATE FILED

06/13/2019:THREE DAY WRITTEN NOTICE TO VACATE FILED

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KATELYN DRAKE **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

06/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KATELYN DRAKE **SENT TO HCSO FOR SERVICE

DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS **CONT TO 07122019 1030AM

06/28/2019:DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS **CONT TO 07122019 1030AM

RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS FOR KATELYN DRAKE SERVED ON 06142019

07/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS FOR KATELYN DRAKE SERVED ON 06142019

CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

06/13/2019:CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS FOR KATELYN DRAKE SERVED ON 06142019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE EVICTION SUMMONS FOR TYLER SUGGS SERVED ON 06142019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Event EVICTION HEARING scheduled on 7/12/2019 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISPOSITION SHEET FROM COURT SEE FOR DETAILS **CONT TO 07122019 1030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT **SENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Event EVICTION HEARING scheduled on 6/28/2019 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge DAVID HORTON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING 06282019 11AM **MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • FILE SENT TO JUDGE HORTON'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • ANSWER FILED BY KATELYN DRAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • THREE DAY WRITTEN NOTICE TO VACATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 252019CC000112CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Judge: HORTON , DAVID assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Event Date: 07/12/2019 10:30; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: EVICTION HEARING; Location: MX COURTROOM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Event Date: 06/28/2019 11:00; Judge: HORTON, DAVID; Docket Type: EVICTION HEARING; Location: MX COURTROOM A

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.