This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 03/17/2022 at 15:33:52 (UTC).

WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AM VS WISE, CARL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WISE, CARL. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAFF, SONNY, SONNY SCAFF and SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAFF, SONNY

SONNY SCAFF

SCAFF, KENNETH NORRIS JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AM

Defendant

WISE, CARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/15/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/15/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

02/15/2022:PRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/3/22

03/04/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/3/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/05/2022 09:00; Judge: SCAFF, SONNY; Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CON; Location: HAMILTON COUNTY COURTHOUSE ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (SERVED) SUMMONS ON 3/3/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice disposition on 3/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 49602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketActive Process PreTrial Conference and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CON scheduled on 4/5/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge SONNY SCAFF presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase 242022SC000012SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSFS, FSB, as Trustee for CVI SGP Acquis. Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW