This case was last updated from Hamilton County Florida Courts on 02/24/2022 at 16:27:35 (UTC).

WISENER, REBEKAH LYNN VS WISENER, MICKEY DON

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 WISENER, REBEKAH LYNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WISENER, MICKEY DON. This case was filed in Hamilton County Florida Courts, Hamilton County Courthouse located in Hamilton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYAN, PAUL S and BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hamilton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYAN, PAUL S

BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WISENER, REBEKAH LYNN

Respondent

WISENER, MICKEY DON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketJudge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CHOCTAW COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - SUMMONS TO BE SERVED W/ CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketINDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketINDIGENCY APPLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MICKEY WISENER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE - REBEKAH WISENER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCase 242022DR000017DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less